There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To accept the request of the Prairie Island Indian Community to revoke their charter of incorporation issued under the Indian Reorganization Act.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-261. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/28/1996Presented to President.
09/26/1996Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H11262-11263)
09/19/1996Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11053-11054)
09/03/1996Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 104-361.
05/22/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
05/20/1996Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-584.
03/12/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-261. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/28/1996HousePresented to President.
09/26/1996-1:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/1996-1:50pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H11262-11263)
09/26/1996-1:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/26/1996-1:43pmHouseMr. Saxton moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
09/20/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/19/1996SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11053-11054)
09/03/1996SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 573.
09/03/1996SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 104-361.
07/24/1996SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/23/1996SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
05/22/1996-10:44amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/1996-10:44amHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
05/22/1996-10:42amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5388-5389)
05/22/1996-10:40amHouseMr. Hastings (WA) asked unanimous consent to discharge the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and consider.
05/20/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 288.
05/20/1996HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-584.
05/16/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/16/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/16/1996HouseSubcommittee on Native American and Insular Affairs Discharged.
03/15/1996HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
03/15/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Native American and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/12/1996HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
03/12/1996HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources03/12/1996 Referred to
05/16/1996 Markup by
05/20/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-584
House Resources Subcommittee on Native American and Insular Affairs03/15/1996 Referred to
05/16/1996 Discharged from
Senate Indian Affairs05/23/1996 Referred to
07/24/1996 Markup by
09/03/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-361

No related bill information was received for H.R.3068.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3068. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/19/1996)

Accepts the request of the Prairie Island Indian Community to revoke its charter of incorporation issued under the Indian Recognition Act. Revokes such charter.

Amends the Jicarilla Apache Tribe Water Rights Settlement Act to extend the deadline for completion of all requirements necessary to effect such Act to December 31, 1998.

Amends the San Carlos Apache Tribe Water Rights Settlement Act of 1992 to extend the deadline for completion of all requirements necessary to effect such Act to June 30, 1997.