Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/13/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/01/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/01/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/20/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/20/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/27/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/27/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/27/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/09/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/11/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/11/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/12/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/16/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/16/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/16/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/23/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/23/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/04/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/04/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/11/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/12/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/26/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/27/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/27/1996