Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/19/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/19/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/19/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/19/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/19/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/19/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 04/22/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/22/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/22/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/22/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/22/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/22/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/22/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/22/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/22/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/22/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/01/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/01/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/01/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/01/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/01/1996
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/01/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/01/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/01/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 05/01/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/01/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/01/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/01/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/01/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/01/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/01/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/01/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/01/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/01/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 05/01/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/01/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/01/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/01/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/01/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/01/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/01/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/01/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/01/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/01/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/01/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/01/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/01/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/01/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/01/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/01/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/01/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/01/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/01/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/01/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/01/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/01/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 05/01/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/16/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/16/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/16/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/16/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/16/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/16/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/16/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/16/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/16/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/16/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/16/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/16/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/16/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/16/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/16/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/16/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/16/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/16/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 05/16/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/16/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/16/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/16/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/16/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/16/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 05/16/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/16/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/05/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/05/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/05/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/05/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/05/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/05/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/05/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/05/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/05/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/05/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/05/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/05/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/05/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/05/1996