Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/10/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/16/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/16/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/29/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/04/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/04/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/06/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/06/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/06/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/10/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/10/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/10/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/10/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/23/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/23/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/23/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/08/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/08/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/13/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/16/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/16/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/20/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/20/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 09/28/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/30/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/28/1996