Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/20/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 03/20/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/20/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/22/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/22/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/27/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/15/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/15/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/15/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 04/15/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/17/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/17/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/30/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/30/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/30/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/07/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/10/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/10/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/10/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/10/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/10/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/15/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/23/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/23/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/23/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/30/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/04/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/05/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/05/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/05/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/05/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/11/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/12/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/12/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/12/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/19/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/25/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/11/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/11/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/11/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/16/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/16/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/1996