Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/22/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/15/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/15/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/07/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/25/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/26/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/04/1996