Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/27/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/27/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/27/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/27/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/02/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/02/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/15/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/16/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/13/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/30/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/28/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew