There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Transport Correction Advancement Act of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to exempt from regulation the transportation of certain hazardous materials by vehicles with a gross vehicle weight rating of 10,000 pounds or less.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/24/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.
09/17/1996Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 104-791.
03/22/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
09/24/1996SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/24/1996-12:47pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/24/1996-12:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/1996-12:47pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote.
09/24/1996-12:47pmHouseH.Amdt.1387 On agreeing to the Petri amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
09/24/1996-12:47pmHouseH.Amdt.1387 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A001) and on the bill without objection.
09/24/1996-12:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with debate on the amendment in the nature of a substitute and the bill.
09/24/1996-12:23pmHouseH.Amdt.1387 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Petri.
09/24/1996-12:23pmHouseConsidered from the Corrections Calendar. (consideration: CR H10775-10779)
09/24/1996-12:23pmHouseCalled up from the Corrections Calendar for consideration.
09/18/1996HousePlaced on the Corrections Calendar, Calendar No. 21.
09/17/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 429.
09/17/1996HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 104-791.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/12/1996HouseSubcommittee on Surface Transportation Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/12/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/12/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/04/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/22/1996HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/22/1996HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E434)
03/22/1996HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/22/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [R-LA-7]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/22/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/22/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/15/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/15/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/15/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/25/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/10/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/15/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/15/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/15/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/15/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/21/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/21/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/05/1996
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/05/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/22/1996 Referred to
09/12/1996 Markup by
09/17/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-791
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Surface Transportation04/04/1996 Referred to
09/12/1996 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3153.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/24/1996)

Small Business Transport Correction Advancement Act of 1996 - Sets forth a deadline for the issuance of a final rule relating to materials of trade exceptions for intrastate transportation of hazardous materials from requirements of Federal transportation law for hazardous materials transportation. Declares that any final rule that prohibits States from granting exceptions for not-for-hire intrastate transportation by farmers and farm-related service industries shall not take effect before the earlier of specified dates.