Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/22/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/22/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/22/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/22/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/15/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/15/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/15/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/25/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/10/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/15/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/15/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/15/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/15/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/21/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/21/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/05/1996
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/05/1996