Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 03/29/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/29/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/16/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/01/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/06/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/06/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/1996