Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/27/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 03/27/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/29/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/29/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/29/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/18/1996
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/18/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/18/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/18/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/18/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/24/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/24/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/01/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/01/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/06/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/09/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/10/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/21/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/29/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/29/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/17/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/27/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/27/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/27/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/27/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/16/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/16/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/16/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/16/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/16/1996