Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/18/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/18/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/18/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/18/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/18/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/25/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/25/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/09/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/09/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/09/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/09/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/09/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/09/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/23/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/23/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/23/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 05/23/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/23/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/23/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/30/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/30/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/30/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/30/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/30/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/30/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/30/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/30/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/30/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/30/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/30/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/30/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/13/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/13/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/13/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/13/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/27/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/27/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/27/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/27/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/12/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/12/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/12/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/31/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/31/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/12/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/12/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/27/1996