Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/28/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/28/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/29/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/29/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/17/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/18/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/23/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/23/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/23/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/23/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/25/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/25/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 04/29/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/29/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/29/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/29/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/07/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/09/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/10/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/15/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/30/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/12/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/12/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/12/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/19/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/19/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/24/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/25/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/25/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/25/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/27/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/27/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/27/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 07/08/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/09/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/09/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/11/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/16/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/26/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/30/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/31/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/31/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/31/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 08/02/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 08/02/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/25/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/25/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/25/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/25/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/26/1996