Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/29/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/30/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/30/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/30/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/30/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/30/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/30/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/30/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/30/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/30/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/30/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/30/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/30/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/30/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/30/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/30/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/30/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/02/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/02/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/02/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/02/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/02/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/02/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/02/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/02/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/02/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/02/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/07/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 05/07/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/07/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/07/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/08/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/08/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/10/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/10/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/14/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/14/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/15/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/15/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/16/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/16/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/21/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/21/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/21/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/22/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/22/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/22/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/22/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/22/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/22/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/29/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/29/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/29/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/06/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/06/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/06/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/06/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/10/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/10/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/10/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/10/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/20/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/20/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/20/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/20/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/20/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/20/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/20/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/27/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/27/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/27/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/27/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/27/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/11/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/11/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/11/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/11/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/11/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/11/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/11/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/17/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/17/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/18/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/29/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/29/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 07/29/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/17/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/17/1996