There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Amateur Radio Volunteer Services Act of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to facilitate utilization of volunteer resources on behalf of the amateur radio service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/29/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/15/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
03/29/1996Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/1996Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/21/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/06/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/20/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/20/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/20/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/20/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/20/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/20/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/20/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/20/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/09/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/09/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/09/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/17/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/17/1996
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/17/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/17/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/22/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/24/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/25/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/25/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/30/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/01/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/11/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/11/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce03/29/1996 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance04/15/1996 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3207.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3207. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/29/1996)

Amateur Radio Volunteer Services Act of 1996 - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to provide that an individual licensee in the amateur radio service who provides volunteer services to the Federal Communications Commission shall be deemed to be a Federal employee only for purposes of Federal tort claims procedure (the adjudication of claims against Federal employees for damages or injuries caused by the employee while acting within the scope of employment).