Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/21/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 06/06/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/20/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/20/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/20/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/20/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/20/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/20/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/20/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/20/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/09/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/09/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/09/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/17/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/17/1996
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/17/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/17/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/22/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/24/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/25/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/25/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/30/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/01/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/11/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/11/1996