Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/08/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/08/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/29/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/29/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/29/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/29/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/29/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/29/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/29/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/29/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/29/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/29/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/18/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/18/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/18/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/18/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/18/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/20/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/27/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/27/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/27/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/16/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/16/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/23/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/23/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/31/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/31/1996