Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/29/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/16/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/16/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/16/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/30/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/08/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/08/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/13/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/13/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/13/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/11/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/16/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/12/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/24/1996