Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/29/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/17/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/17/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/17/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/17/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/18/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/18/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/25/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/30/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/30/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/08/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/08/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/22/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/29/1996