There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business OSHA Relief Act of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/15/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/21/1996Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5309)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/1996Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
04/17/1996Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
04/16/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities
04/16/1996Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E529)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/1996Referred to the House Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/1996Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (87)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [R-LA-7]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/24/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/24/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/24/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/24/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/24/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/24/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/24/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/24/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/24/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/24/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/24/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/24/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/30/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/30/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/30/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/30/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/30/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 04/30/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/08/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/08/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/08/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/08/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/08/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/08/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/10/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/10/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/10/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/10/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/10/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/10/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/19/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/19/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/19/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/09/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/17/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/17/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Economic and Educational Opportunities04/15/1996 Referred to
House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Workforce Protections04/16/1996 Referred to
04/17/1996 Markup by
04/17/1996 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3234.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3234. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/15/1996)

Small Business OSHA Relief Act of 1996 - Amends the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 (OSHA) to require each OSHA standard promulgated by the Secretary of Labor to be based upon a cost-benefit assessment and a determination that the standard's benefits justify the costs it imposes.

Directs the Secretary, in the case of any employer of 250 or fewer employees cited for a violation of specified requirements, standards, or rules, which is a significant threat to an employee's health or safety, but where the employer has made a good faith correction effort, to waive up to 100 percent of the penalty otherwise proposed for such violation: (1) if the employer corrects the violation within the time set for abatement; or (2), if the employer does not correct the violation within such time, to the extent that the employer uses the amount which would have been paid as the penalty for correction of the violation.

Prohibits issuance of a citation for any posting requirement and any requirement to prepare and maintain injury and illness records or written plan or verification, unless: (1) the employer has willfully or repeatedly violated the requirement; or (2) the failure to meet such requirement has resulted in employee exposure to a hazard.

Directs the Secretary to enter into cooperative agreements with States for consultation to employers concerning the provision of safe and healthful working conditions. Requires the Secretary to reimburse States that enter into such agreements for 90 percent of costs and 100 percent of State staff training and specified out-of-State travel expenses.

Prohibits the Secretary from establishing any performance measures for any subordinate within the Occupational Safety and Health Administration (including any regional director, area director, supervisor, or inspector) with respect to the number of inspections conducted, citations issued, or penalties assessed.