Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/24/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/24/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/24/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/24/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/24/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/24/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/24/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/24/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/24/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/24/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/24/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/24/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/30/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/30/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/30/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/30/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/30/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 04/30/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/08/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/08/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/08/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/08/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/08/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/08/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/10/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/10/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/10/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/10/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/10/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/10/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/19/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/19/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/19/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/09/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/17/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/17/1996