Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/19/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/19/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/19/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/19/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/19/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/19/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/23/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 01/23/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/23/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/27/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/27/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/27/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/27/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/27/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/27/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/27/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 01/27/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/27/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/27/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/27/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/27/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/27/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 01/27/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 01/27/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/31/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/01/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/01/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/03/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/03/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/03/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/03/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/03/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 02/03/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/03/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/06/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/06/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/06/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/06/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/06/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/06/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 02/06/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/07/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/07/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/08/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/08/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/08/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/08/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/10/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/13/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/13/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/13/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/13/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/15/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/15/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/15/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 02/15/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 02/15/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/15/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/15/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/15/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/15/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/15/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/15/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/21/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/21/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/21/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/21/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/21/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/21/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/21/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/21/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/21/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/28/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/28/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 02/28/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/28/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/28/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/28/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/28/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/28/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/28/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/28/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/28/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/28/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/28/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/28/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/14/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/24/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/12/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/20/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/06/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/31/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/01/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/09/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/10/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/17/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 11/17/1995