Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/16/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/30/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/30/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/30/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/30/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/30/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 04/30/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/30/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/30/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/30/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/30/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/07/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/07/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/07/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/07/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/07/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/07/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/07/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/07/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/07/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/07/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/07/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/07/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/10/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/10/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/10/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/10/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/10/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/15/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/15/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/15/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/15/1996