Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/19/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/19/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/19/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/19/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/19/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/19/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/19/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/19/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/19/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 01/23/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/25/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/25/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/25/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 01/26/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/30/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 01/30/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/30/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/02/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/10/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/22/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/02/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/02/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/29/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/08/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/29/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/21/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/30/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/31/1996