Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/17/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/14/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/14/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/14/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/06/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/19/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/17/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/17/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/17/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/17/1996