Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/18/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 04/18/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 04/18/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/19/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/19/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/19/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/16/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/16/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 10/03/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/04/1996