Committees: H.R.3286 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/23/1996 Referred to
05/01/1996 Markup by
05/03/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-542,Part 2
House Resources04/23/1996 Referred to
04/25/1996 Markup by
04/30/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-542,Part 1
House Economic and Educational04/23/1996 Referred to
04/30/1996 Discharged from
House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families04/25/1996 Referred to
Senate Finance05/13/1996 Referred to
06/12/1996 Markup by
06/13/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-279
Senate Indian Affairs06/13/1996 Referred to
06/19/1996 Markup by
06/24/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-288