Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/23/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 04/23/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/23/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/23/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/23/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/23/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/29/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/01/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/01/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/02/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/02/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/02/1996