Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 04/24/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/29/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/29/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/29/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/29/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/06/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/06/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/19/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 06/27/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/27/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/27/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/04/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/05/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/11/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 09/11/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/11/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/11/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/11/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/11/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/11/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/18/1996