Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/25/1996
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 04/25/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/25/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/09/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/29/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/29/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/29/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/06/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/06/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/06/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/06/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/06/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/06/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/06/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/13/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/13/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/13/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/13/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/19/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/19/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/19/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/19/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 06/20/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/20/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/20/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/27/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/27/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/11/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/11/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 07/23/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/23/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/23/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/23/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/02/1996