There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Benefits Amendments of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve certain veterans' benefits programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/21/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/10/1996Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-572.
05/01/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/28/1996HouseSee S.1711.
05/22/1996SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
05/21/1996-2:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/1996-2:48pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/21/1996-2:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
05/21/1996-2:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5313-5315)
05/21/1996-2:35pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/10/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 281.
05/10/1996HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-572.
05/08/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/08/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/01/1996HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/01/1996HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs05/01/1996 Referred to
05/08/1996 Markup by
05/10/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-572
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/1996 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3373. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/1996)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Insurance Reform

Title II: Other Matters

Veterans' Benefits Amendments of 1996 - Title I: Insurance Reform - Amends the Servicemen's Group Life Insurance (SGLI) Program to exclude from coverage under such Program members assigned or transferred to the Retired Reserve.

Provides that, upon termination of active-duty service, a person's coverage under SGLI: (1) shall be automatically converted to Veterans' Group Life Insurance (VGLI), subject to the payment of premiums and other applicable terms and conditions; or (2) shall, at the election of the member, be converted to an individual insurance policy with a participating private insurer selected by the member. Outlines VGLI coverage limits in the case of any person insured under VGLI who becomes insured under SGLI but dies before terminating or converting the VGLI coverage. Terminates VGLI coverage on the effective date of an individual insurance policy with a private insurer.

Directs the Secretary of the military department concerned to provide military personnel with general information concerning life insurance whenever they have the opportunity to elect not to be insured under SGLI or to be insured in an amount less than the maximum $200,000 coverage.

Redesignates the Servicemen's Life Insurance Program as the Servicemembers' Life Insurance Program. Requires the SGLI coverage of any member of the Retired Reserve to be converted to VGLI coverage within 90 days after enactment of this Act.

Title II: Other Matters - Defines a minor child, for purposes of eligibility for burial in national cemeteries, as one under 21 years of age or under 23 years of age if pursuing a program of education in an educational institution.

Requires the offices of Education Procedures Systems, Education Operations, and Education Policy and Program Administration of the Education Service of the Veterans Benefits Administration to be located in the District of Columbia.