Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/07/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/07/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/07/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/10/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/15/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/22/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/31/1996