Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/02/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/02/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 05/02/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/02/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/08/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 05/08/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/16/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/23/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/23/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/30/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/06/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/26/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/26/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/26/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/26/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/09/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/09/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/23/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/23/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/31/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/17/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/18/1996