Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/06/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/06/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/07/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/09/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/09/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/09/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/10/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/10/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/10/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/14/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/14/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/14/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/15/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/15/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/15/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/15/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/15/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/15/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/15/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/15/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/16/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/16/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/16/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/16/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/21/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/21/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/21/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/23/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/23/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/1996