Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/07/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/16/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/16/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/04/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/05/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/12/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/08/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/11/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/12/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/22/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/04/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/18/1996