Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/07/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/09/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 05/09/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/09/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/09/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/09/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/09/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/09/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/14/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/14/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/14/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/14/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/14/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/14/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/14/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/16/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/16/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/16/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/16/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/16/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/16/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/16/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/16/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/16/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 05/22/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/22/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/22/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/22/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/22/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/22/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/22/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/22/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/22/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/22/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/30/1996
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/30/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/30/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/30/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/30/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/30/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/30/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/05/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/05/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/05/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/05/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/05/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/05/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/05/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/05/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/05/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/12/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/12/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/12/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/12/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/13/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/13/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/13/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/13/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/18/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/18/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/18/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/18/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/26/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/26/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/27/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew