Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/08/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/08/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/08/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/14/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/14/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/14/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 05/14/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/14/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/14/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/14/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/14/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/14/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/16/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/16/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/29/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/29/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/29/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/29/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/29/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/29/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/29/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/04/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/04/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/04/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/04/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/12/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/12/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/24/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/24/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/24/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/24/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/24/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/24/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/24/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/24/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/24/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/26/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/26/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/26/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/26/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/12/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/12/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/12/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/18/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/29/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/29/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/29/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/29/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/31/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/31/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/31/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/04/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/11/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/11/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/18/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 09/18/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/24/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/27/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/27/1996