Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/08/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/08/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/08/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 05/08/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/10/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/10/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/10/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/10/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/10/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/10/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/10/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/10/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/10/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/14/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/14/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/14/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/22/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/22/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/22/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/22/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/22/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/05/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/05/1996