Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/09/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/06/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/06/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/22/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/02/1996