Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/12/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/26/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/17/1996