Refine your search

14 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
08/20/1996 Became Public Law No: 104-188. (TXT | PDF)
08/20/1996 Signed by President.
08/08/1996 Presented to President.
08/02/1996 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 76-22. Record Vote No: 265.(consideration: CR S9527)
08/02/1996 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 354 - 72 (Roll no. 398).(consideration: CR H9846-9862)
08/01/1996 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
08/01/1996 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 104-737 filed.(text of conference report: CR H9568-9670)
07/30/1996 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
07/25/1996 To conference: Senate insists on its amendments asks for a conference, appoints conferees Kassebaum; Kennedy; Jeffords from the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.(consideration: CR S8820)
07/09/1996 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 74-24. Record Vote No: 186.
06/18/1996 Committee on Finance. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth with an amendment. With written report No. 104-281.
05/22/1996 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 414 - 10 (Roll no. 190).
05/20/1996 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 104-586.
05/14/1996 Introduced in House