There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend the enhanced loan asset sale authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/15/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
06/19/1996For Further Action See H.R.3673.
05/30/1996Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training, Employment and Housing
05/30/1996Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training, Employment and Housing
05/16/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Education, Training, Employment and Housing.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/15/1996Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/1996Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/15/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs05/15/1996 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training, Employment and Housing05/16/1996 Referred to
05/30/1996 Markup by
05/30/1996 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3459. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/15/1996)

Extends through December 31, 1997, the authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to sell certificates or other securities evidencing an interest in a pool of mortgage loans made to veterans under the veterans' housing loan guarantee program.