Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/15/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/15/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/21/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/22/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/29/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/29/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/29/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/29/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/29/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/29/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/29/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/29/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/29/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 05/29/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/12/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/12/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/12/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/12/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/29/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/18/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/18/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/25/1996