Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/16/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/21/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/21/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/22/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/22/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/23/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/23/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/23/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/30/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/06/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/20/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/09/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/23/1996