Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/21/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 05/21/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 05/21/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/29/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/29/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/29/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/29/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/29/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/29/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/29/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/11/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/31/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/31/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/17/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/26/1996