Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/22/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/29/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/29/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/29/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/29/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/29/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/29/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/29/1996
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/29/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/27/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/12/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/12/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/17/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew