Committees: H.R.3517 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations02/06/1996 Referred to
05/23/1996 Markup by
05/23/1996 Reported original measure H. Rept. 104-591
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Military Construction02/06/1996 Referred to
03/28/1996 Hearings by
05/21/1996 Markup by
05/21/1996 Reported by
Senate Appropriations06/03/1996 Referred to
06/20/1996 Markup by
06/20/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-287
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Military Construction06/18/1996 Markup by
06/18/1996 Reported by