Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/23/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/23/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/23/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/29/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/29/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/29/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/06/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/18/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/25/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/27/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/27/1996