Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/23/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/06/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/06/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/06/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/06/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/06/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/06/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/10/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/10/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/10/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 06/11/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/11/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/11/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/11/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/11/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/11/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/11/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/11/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/11/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/11/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/11/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/11/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/11/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/11/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/11/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/11/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/11/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/11/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/11/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/11/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 06/11/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/11/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/11/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/11/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/11/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/11/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/11/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 06/11/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/11/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/11/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/11/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/11/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/11/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/11/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/11/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/11/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/12/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/12/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/12/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/12/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/12/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/12/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/12/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/12/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/12/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/12/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/13/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/13/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/13/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/13/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/17/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/17/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/17/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/17/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/17/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/17/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/17/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/17/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/17/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/17/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/1996