Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/20/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/20/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/30/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 01/30/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/30/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 01/30/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/30/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/30/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/30/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/30/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 01/30/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/30/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/30/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/30/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/30/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/30/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 01/30/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/08/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/08/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/08/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/08/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/08/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/08/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/08/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/08/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/08/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/08/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/16/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/16/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/16/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/16/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/16/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/16/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/16/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/16/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/16/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/16/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/16/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/07/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/07/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/07/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/07/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/07/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/07/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/07/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/07/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/07/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/07/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/24/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/24/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/24/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/24/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/30/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/30/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/30/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/30/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/30/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/02/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/13/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/11/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/11/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/12/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/02/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/05/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/14/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew